THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:49:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1132 Tighe Street
Ottawa Ontario K4M 1A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-800-6207
Fax: 613-703-1619
Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Pediatrics
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Phone: 613-721-2000
Extension: 2127
Fax: 613-703-1619

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelley Zwicker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Zwicker (CPSO#: 108671 )
Business Address: 1132 Tighe Street
Ottawa Ontario K4M 1A4
6138006207
Business Address: 4289 Innes Rd
Orléans ON K1E 0A8
6136861911

Corporation Name: K. Zwicker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Dec 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1132 Tighe Street
Ottawa Ontario K4M 1A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-800-6207
Fax: 613-703-1619
Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Pediatrics
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Phone: 613-721-2000
Extension: 2127
Fax: 613-703-1619

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelley Zwicker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Zwicker (CPSO#: 108671 )
Business Address: 1132 Tighe Street
Ottawa Ontario K4M 1A4
6138006207
Business Address: 4289 Innes Rd
Orléans ON K1E 0A8
6136861911

Corporation Name: K. Zwicker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Dec 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLEY ANN ZWICKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZWICKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLEY ANN ZWICKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZWICKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2016
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2016