THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:31:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2950 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON M1J 2E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-438-6633
Fax: 416-438-3633

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Apr 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2950 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON M1J 2E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-438-6633
Fax: 416-438-3633

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Apr 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
11 Sep 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 11 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Eeson Namasivayam may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Eeson Namasivayam may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 11 Sep 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 15 Sep 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Aug 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2016