THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:42:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dual Diagnosis Consultation
Providence Care Mental Health
Services
301 - 234 Concession St
Kingston Ontario K7K 6W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 530-2400
Fax: (613) 530-2212
Address: 289 Pinnacle Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 3B3
Phone: (613)962-2541
Fax: (613)962-6357
Address: 234 Concession Street
Kingston Ontario K7M 6W6
Phone: (613) 530-2400
Extension: 23
Fax: (613) 530-2212

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 06 Apr 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Muhammad Nasar Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khan (CPSO#: 108685 )
Business Address: Providence Care Mental Health Services
301-234 Concession Street
Kingston Ontario K7K 6W6
(613) 530-2400 Extn: 23
Business Address: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-3232
Business Address: Pathways to Independence
289 Pinnacle Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 3B3
(613) 962-2541

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dual Diagnosis Consultation
Providence Care Mental Health
Services
301 - 234 Concession St
Kingston Ontario K7K 6W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 530-2400
Fax: (613) 530-2212
Address: 289 Pinnacle Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 3B3
Phone: (613)962-2541
Fax: (613)962-6357
Address: 234 Concession Street
Kingston Ontario K7M 6W6
Phone: (613) 530-2400
Extension: 23
Fax: (613) 530-2212

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 06 Apr 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Muhammad Nasar Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khan (CPSO#: 108685 )
Business Address: Providence Care Mental Health Services
301-234 Concession Street
Kingston Ontario K7K 6W6
(613) 530-2400 Extn: 23
Business Address: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-3232
Business Address: Pathways to Independence
289 Pinnacle Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 3B3
(613) 962-2541

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
29 May 2024
30 Jun 2029
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 29 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2029
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Muhammad Nasar Sayeed Khan may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry, Queen's University, in which Dr. Khan holds an academic
appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Khan no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate is issued on April 6, 2016, and expires on June 30,
2029. Upon renewal of Dr. Khan's academic appointment at Queen's
University, the expiry date can be extended.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Muhammad Nasar Sayeed Khan may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry, Queen's University, in which Dr. Khan holds an academic
appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Khan no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate is issued on April 6, 2016, and expires on June 30,
2029. Upon renewal of Dr. Khan's academic appointment at Queen's
University, the expiry date can be extended.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2029
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2016
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2029

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2016