THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:49:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 330 Université Ave
Moncton NB E1C 2Z3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 27 Mar 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 01 Apr 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 27 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AMEER ASLAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Aslam (CPSO#: 108714 )
Business Address: 310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
519-421-4211

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 330 Université Ave
Moncton NB E1C 2Z3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 27 Mar 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 01 Apr 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 27 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AMEER ASLAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Aslam (CPSO#: 108714 )
Business Address: 310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
519-421-4211

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMEER ASLAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASLAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMEER ASLAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASLAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Aug 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016