THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:09:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-100 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 9B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 365-877-9595
Fax: 905-878-6161

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact FileBank at: 416-798-1404.
Date Received: 05 Jan 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. WAGDI WILLIAM MEGALLY SALIB MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Salib (CPSO#: 108719 )
Business Address: 1-604 Santa Maria Blvd
Milton ON L9T 9L7
(905)878-0055

Corporation Name: Dr. Wagdi William Megally Salib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-100 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 9B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 365-877-9595
Fax: 905-878-6161

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact FileBank at: 416-798-1404.
Date Received: 05 Jan 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. WAGDI WILLIAM MEGALLY SALIB MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Salib (CPSO#: 108719 )
Business Address: 1-604 Santa Maria Blvd
Milton ON L9T 9L7
(905)878-0055

Corporation Name: Dr. Wagdi William Megally Salib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAGDI WILLIAM MEGALLY SALIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALIB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAGDI WILLIAM MEGALLY SALIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALIB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 May 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 May 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 10 May 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2016