THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:30:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: zaid medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zaid (CPSO#: 108720 )
Business Address: 840 McConnell Ave
Cornwall ON K6H 5S5
613-938-4240

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: zaid medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zaid (CPSO#: 108720 )
Business Address: 840 McConnell Ave
Cornwall ON K6H 5S5
613-938-4240

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AKRAM ALI ZAID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAID is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AKRAM ALI ZAID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAID is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2016
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2016