THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 07:43:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 12 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C.E. Orellana Medicine Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Orellana (CPSO#: 108735 ) Dr. C. Orellana (CPSO#: 108875 )
Business Address: 6-564 Weber St N
Waterloo ON N2L 5C6
647-948-5711

Corporation Name: Dr A Orellana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Orellana (CPSO#: 108735 )
Business Address: 6-564 Weber Street North
Waterloo Ontario N2L
Business Address: 222 Pioneer Tower Rd
Kitchener ON N2P 2H8
Business Address: 216 Glengrove Ave W
Toronto ON M4R 1P3
6475675341
Business Address: 222 Pioneer Tower Rd
Kitchener ON N2P 2H8

Corporation Name: Dr. C.E. Orellana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Jun 2023

Corporation Name: Dr. C.E. Orellana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Aug 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 12 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C.E. Orellana Medicine Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Orellana (CPSO#: 108735 ) Dr. C. Orellana (CPSO#: 108875 )
Business Address: 6-564 Weber St N
Waterloo ON N2L 5C6
647-948-5711

Corporation Name: Dr A Orellana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Orellana (CPSO#: 108735 )
Business Address: 6-564 Weber Street North
Waterloo Ontario N2L
Business Address: 222 Pioneer Tower Rd
Kitchener ON N2P 2H8
Business Address: 216 Glengrove Ave W
Toronto ON M4R 1P3
6475675341
Business Address: 222 Pioneer Tower Rd
Kitchener ON N2P 2H8

Corporation Name: Dr. C.E. Orellana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Jun 2023

Corporation Name: Dr. C.E. Orellana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Aug 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA VLADIMIROVNA ORELLANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORELLANA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA VLADIMIROVNA ORELLANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORELLANA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016