THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:09:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rajshahi Medical College, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: One Health Family Practice
105 - 300 Rossland Rd E
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-239-7663
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 155 Mostar Street
Unit 3
Whitchurch-Stouffville Ontario L4A 0Y2
Phone: 905-640-3000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Bangladesh

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sadea Arefin Laboni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Laboni (CPSO#: 108744 )
Business Address: 105-300 Rossland Rd E

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI
Medical School: Rajshahi Medical College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: One Health Family Practice
105 - 300 Rossland Rd E
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-239-7663
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 155 Mostar Street
Unit 3
Whitchurch-Stouffville Ontario L4A 0Y2
Phone: 905-640-3000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Bangladesh

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sadea Arefin Laboni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Laboni (CPSO#: 108744 )
Business Address: 105-300 Rossland Rd E

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SADEA AREFIN LABONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABONI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SADEA AREFIN LABONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABONI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rajshahi Medical College, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Feb 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016