THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 07:47:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3400 Danforth Avenue, Unit 6.
East York Ontario M1L 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-693-3030
Fax: 416-693-3033

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Miten Dhruve Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dhruve (CPSO#: 108775 )
Business Address: 250 Marlee Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6B 1N6
(416) 783-0000
Business Address: 6 - 3400 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1L 1E1
(416) 693-3030
Business Address: 807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
(416) 461-9471
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6580

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3400 Danforth Avenue, Unit 6.
East York Ontario M1L 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-693-3030
Fax: 416-693-3033

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Miten Dhruve Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dhruve (CPSO#: 108775 )
Business Address: 250 Marlee Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6B 1N6
(416) 783-0000
Business Address: 6 - 3400 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1L 1E1
(416) 693-3030
Business Address: 807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
(416) 461-9471
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6580

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MITEN JITENDRA DHRUVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHRUVE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MITEN JITENDRA DHRUVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHRUVE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016