THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:49:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1160 Beaverwood Road
Ottawa Ontario K4M1E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 692-0244
Fax: 613-692-0258
Address: 310 Titan Pvt
Nepean ON K2G 0B1
Phone: (613) 656-1450
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Bocz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bocz (CPSO#: 108779 )
Business Address: 2431 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1V 8R9
(613) 737-0811
Business Address: 333 Country Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
(613) 256-3095
Business Address: 480 Brigitta Street
Stittsville Ontario K2S 0K7
(613) 595-1116
Business Address: 1160 Beaverwood Road
Manotick Ontario K4M 1E2
(613) 692-0244
Business Address: 491 Richmond Road
Ottawa Ontario K2A 1G4
(613) 728-9274

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1160 Beaverwood Road
Ottawa Ontario K4M1E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 692-0244
Fax: 613-692-0258
Address: 310 Titan Pvt
Nepean ON K2G 0B1
Phone: (613) 656-1450
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Bocz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bocz (CPSO#: 108779 )
Business Address: 2431 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1V 8R9
(613) 737-0811
Business Address: 333 Country Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
(613) 256-3095
Business Address: 480 Brigitta Street
Stittsville Ontario K2S 0K7
(613) 595-1116
Business Address: 1160 Beaverwood Road
Manotick Ontario K4M 1E2
(613) 692-0244
Business Address: 491 Richmond Road
Ottawa Ontario K2A 1G4
(613) 728-9274

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER CHRISTINA BOCZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOCZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER CHRISTINA BOCZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOCZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Dec 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016