THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:48:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sint Eustatius, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bayfield House Medical Clinic
5 Beck Blvd
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 549 5677
Fax: 705 549 1414
Address: Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
PO Box 760
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Aug 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Iowa

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian J. Gaffney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Gaffney (CPSO#: 108787 )
Business Address: Bayfield House Medical Clinic
5 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1C1
(705) 549-5677

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Sint Eustatius, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bayfield House Medical Clinic
5 Beck Blvd
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 549 5677
Fax: 705 549 1414
Address: Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
PO Box 760
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Aug 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Iowa

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian J. Gaffney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Gaffney (CPSO#: 108787 )
Business Address: Bayfield House Medical Clinic
5 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1C1
(705) 549-5677

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 May 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 16 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Brian James Gaffney may practise medicine independently in family medicine
and emergency medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Brian James Gaffney may practise medicine independently in family medicine
and emergency medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sint Eustatius, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Jan 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Jan 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 May 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016