THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 03:50:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058487100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JIE ZOU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zou (CPSO#: 108797 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058487100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JIE ZOU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zou (CPSO#: 108797 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JIE ZOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZOU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JIE ZOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZOU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016