THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:19:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Benin, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4-15 Henderson St
Port Hope ON L1A 0C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058858686
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30-785 Westney Rd S
Ajax ON L1S 7G1
Phone: 9054266068
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7-2727 Courtice Rd
Courtice ON L1E 3A2
Phone: 9052331919
Fax: 9052408550
Address: HALO Medical Clinic
Unit B7
2727 Courtice Road
Courtice Ontario L1E 3A2
Phone: 905 233 1919
Fax: 905 240 8550

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Obomighie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Obomighie (CPSO#: 108807 )
Business Address: Halo Medical Clinic
Suite B7
2727 Courtice Road
Whitby Ontario L1E 3A2
(905) 233-1919
Business Address: Suite 4
15 Henderson Street
Port Hope Ontario L1A 0C6
Business Address: 7 - 15 Rosswell Drive
Courtice Ontario L1E 0E2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Benin, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4-15 Henderson St
Port Hope ON L1A 0C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058858686
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30-785 Westney Rd S
Ajax ON L1S 7G1
Phone: 9054266068
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7-2727 Courtice Rd
Courtice ON L1E 3A2
Phone: 9052331919
Fax: 9052408550
Address: HALO Medical Clinic
Unit B7
2727 Courtice Road
Courtice Ontario L1E 3A2
Phone: 905 233 1919
Fax: 905 240 8550

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Obomighie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Obomighie (CPSO#: 108807 )
Business Address: Halo Medical Clinic
Suite B7
2727 Courtice Road
Whitby Ontario L1E 3A2
(905) 233-1919
Business Address: Suite 4
15 Henderson Street
Port Hope Ontario L1A 0C6
Business Address: 7 - 15 Rosswell Drive
Courtice Ontario L1E 0E2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUDE ESHIEBOH OBOMIGHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OBOMIGHIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUDE ESHIEBOH OBOMIGHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OBOMIGHIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Benin, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Apr 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 May 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 May 2016