THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 06:11:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton General Hospital
Cardiac surgery division
McMaster wing, Room 500b
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44553
Fax: (905) 577-1405

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Alraddadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Alraddadi (CPSO#: 108815 )
Business Address: suite 17-99 Panabaker Drive
Hamilton Ontario L9G 5E3
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton general hospital
Cardiac surgery division
McMaster wing, Office 500b
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 44553

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton General Hospital
Cardiac surgery division
McMaster wing, Room 500b
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44553
Fax: (905) 577-1405

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Alraddadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Alraddadi (CPSO#: 108815 )
Business Address: suite 17-99 Panabaker Drive
Hamilton Ontario L9G 5E3
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton general hospital
Cardiac surgery division
McMaster wing, Office 500b
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 44553

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HATIM OSAMA H ALRADDADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALRADDADI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HATIM OSAMA H ALRADDADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALRADDADI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 May 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 2016