THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:12:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cleveland Clinic Canada
150 Eglinton Avenue East
5th Floor
Toronto Ontario M4P 1E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-507-6600
Fax: 416-481-1267
Address: Lakeridge Health Port Perry
451 Paxton Street
Port Perry Ontario L9L 1L9
Phone: (416) 978-4678
Fax: 416-971-2846
Address: 100 Devonshire Pl
David L. MacIntosh Sport Medicine Clinic
University of Toronto
4th Floor
Toronto ON M5S 2C9
Phone: (416) 978-4678
Fax: 416-971-2846

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: FRANCELLA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Francella (CPSO#: 108826 )
Business Address: 706-280 Simcoe St
Toronto ON M5T 2Y5
6472215025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cleveland Clinic Canada
150 Eglinton Avenue East
5th Floor
Toronto Ontario M4P 1E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-507-6600
Fax: 416-481-1267
Address: Lakeridge Health Port Perry
451 Paxton Street
Port Perry Ontario L9L 1L9
Phone: (416) 978-4678
Fax: 416-971-2846
Address: 100 Devonshire Pl
David L. MacIntosh Sport Medicine Clinic
University of Toronto
4th Floor
Toronto ON M5S 2C9
Phone: (416) 978-4678
Fax: 416-971-2846

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: FRANCELLA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Francella (CPSO#: 108826 )
Business Address: 706-280 Simcoe St
Toronto ON M5T 2Y5
6472215025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALESSANDRO FRANCELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANCELLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALESSANDRO FRANCELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANCELLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016