THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:10:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204 Richmond Street
Thorold Ontario L2V 5A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-362-6262
Fax: 1-289-715-2560
Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Critical Care
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines General Hospital
Respiratory Department
Room 2A19.027
St. Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: (289)-362-6262
Fax: (289) 715-2560
Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines General Hospital
Respiratory Department
Room 2A19.027
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: (289)-362-6262
Fax: 1-(289) 715-2560
Address: 180 John Street
#614
Toronto Ontario M5T 1X5
Phone: 647-697-6973
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Respirology
Effective: 19 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Farooqi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Farooqi (CPSO#: 108859 )
Business Address: 204 Richmond Street
Thorold Ontario L2V 5A7
2893626262
Business Address: 51 Citation Cres
Ancaster ON L9K 1H8
289-362-6262

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204 Richmond Street
Thorold Ontario L2V 5A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-362-6262
Fax: 1-289-715-2560
Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Critical Care
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines General Hospital
Respiratory Department
Room 2A19.027
St. Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: (289)-362-6262
Fax: (289) 715-2560
Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines General Hospital
Respiratory Department
Room 2A19.027
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: (289)-362-6262
Fax: 1-(289) 715-2560
Address: 180 John Street
#614
Toronto Ontario M5T 1X5
Phone: 647-697-6973
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Respirology
Effective: 19 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Farooqi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Farooqi (CPSO#: 108859 )
Business Address: 204 Richmond Street
Thorold Ontario L2V 5A7
2893626262
Business Address: 51 Citation Cres
Ancaster ON L9K 1H8
289-362-6262

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ABDUL MALIK FAROOQI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAROOQI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ABDUL MALIK FAROOQI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAROOQI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Nov 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016