THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:24:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339 Windermere Road
University Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre Arrhythmia Service
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3746
Fax: (519) 663-3782
Address: 1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Cardiac Institute
Suite 201
London Ontario N6A 5P6
Phone: (519) 645-0146
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 19 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339 Windermere Road
University Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre Arrhythmia Service
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3746
Fax: (519) 663-3782
Address: 1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Cardiac Institute
Suite 201
London Ontario N6A 5P6
Phone: (519) 645-0146
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 19 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMED TAREK AHMED AHMED MOUSTAFA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSTAFA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMED TAREK AHMED AHMED MOUSTAFA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSTAFA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Nov 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016