THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:51:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dundee, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Elizabeth St
Orangeville Ontario L9W 7N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-938-8000
Fax: 5199388080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jamie Van Der Ham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Van Der Ham (CPSO#: 108869 )
Business Address: 1 Elizabeth St
Orangeville ON L9W 7N7
5199388000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dundee, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Elizabeth St
Orangeville Ontario L9W 7N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-938-8000
Fax: 5199388080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jamie Van Der Ham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Van Der Ham (CPSO#: 108869 )
Business Address: 1 Elizabeth St
Orangeville ON L9W 7N7
5199388000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMIE THOMAS VAN DER HAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN DER HAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMIE THOMAS VAN DER HAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN DER HAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dundee, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Sep 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016