THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:55:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, PUSHTO, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9021 Derry Road, Unit 12
Milton ON L9T 7Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-878-1977
Fax: 905-878-8158

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ali (CPSO#: 108873 )
Business Address: 573 Dundas Street East
Waterdown Ontario L8B0G7
6472394790
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, PUSHTO, URDU
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9021 Derry Road, Unit 12
Milton ON L9T 7Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-878-1977
Fax: 905-878-8158

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ali (CPSO#: 108873 )
Business Address: 573 Dundas Street East
Waterdown Ontario L8B0G7
6472394790
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALIYA ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALIYA ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016