THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:25:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: Chandran Pillai, Aiswarya Lekshmi Pillai (Used Until: 08 May 2017)
Medical School: Medical College Thiruvananthapuram, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MALAYALAM

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Extension: 52538
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 Jan 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 18 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aiswarya Pillai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pillai (CPSO#: 108879 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9

General Information

Former Name: Chandran Pillai, Aiswarya Lekshmi Pillai (Used Until: 08 May 2017)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MALAYALAM
Medical School: Medical College Thiruvananthapuram, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Extension: 52538
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 Jan 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 18 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aiswarya Pillai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pillai (CPSO#: 108879 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AISWARYA PILLAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PILLAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AISWARYA PILLAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PILLAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical College Thiruvananthapuram, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Jan 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016