THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:27:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 John Marks Ave
Kingston Ontario K7K 0J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 507-7246
Fax: No Information Available
Address: H“pital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
20260 County Rd 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
Phone: (613) 525-2222
Fax: 613-525-4515
Address: 1770 Woodward Dr
Ottawa ON K2C 0P8
Phone: 6137552095
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alexandria

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meredith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Meredith (CPSO#: 108882 )
Business Address: KOPI
800 John Marks Avenue
Kingston Ontario K7K 7G2
(613) 507-7246

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of London, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 John Marks Ave
Kingston Ontario K7K 0J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 507-7246
Fax: No Information Available
Address: H“pital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
20260 County Rd 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
Phone: (613) 525-2222
Fax: 613-525-4515
Address: 1770 Woodward Dr
Ottawa ON K2C 0P8
Phone: 6137552095
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alexandria

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meredith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Meredith (CPSO#: 108882 )
Business Address: KOPI
800 John Marks Avenue
Kingston Ontario K7K 7G2
(613) 507-7246

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEL WILLIAM MEREDITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEREDITH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEL WILLIAM MEREDITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEREDITH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016