THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 03:40:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1935 Paris Street
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 3C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055221500
Fax: 7055221820

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre Sudbury Sudbury
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre Sudbury
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christine M. S. Tang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tang (CPSO#: 108889 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1935 Paris Street
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 3C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055221500
Fax: 7055221820

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre Sudbury Sudbury
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre Sudbury
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christine M. S. Tang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tang (CPSO#: 108889 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MEI SEE TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MEI SEE TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016