THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:14:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 13110 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 1A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 604 9522
Fax: (289) 870 2500
Address: 3900 Rutherford Rd
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 3G8
Phone: (905) 417-5461
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Davoudpour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Davoudpour (CPSO#: 108896 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 13110 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 1A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 604 9522
Fax: (289) 870 2500
Address: 3900 Rutherford Rd
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 3G8
Phone: (905) 417-5461
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Davoudpour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Davoudpour (CPSO#: 108896 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMADREZA DAVOUDPOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVOUDPOUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMADREZA DAVOUDPOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVOUDPOUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 May 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 May 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 May 2016