THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:54:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 14 Apr 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 14 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Basem Eldeyasty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Eldeyasty (CPSO#: 108905 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 14 Apr 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 14 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Basem Eldeyasty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Eldeyasty (CPSO#: 108905 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Apr 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 10 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. BASEM KHAIRY ABDELHAY ELDEYASTY may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. BASEM KHAIRY ABDELHAY ELDEYASTY may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Apr 2025
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 13 Apr 2027
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Apr 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 13 Apr 2027

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016