THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:56:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: KERMAN UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 306-1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 1Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-943-2530
Fax: 416-987-3715
Address: suite 306-1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 1Z1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 416-987-3715
Address: 103-333 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3H 1S8
Phone: 4166319888
Fax: 647-478-2133

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: dr dortaj medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Dortaj (CPSO#: 108917 )
Business Address: suite 306-1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 1Z1
6479432530

Corporation Name: Dr Dortaj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Oct 2024

Corporation Name: Dr. Dortaj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Feb 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, PERSIAN
Medical School: KERMAN UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 306-1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 1Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-943-2530
Fax: 416-987-3715
Address: suite 306-1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 1Z1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 416-987-3715
Address: 103-333 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3H 1S8
Phone: 4166319888
Fax: 647-478-2133

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: dr dortaj medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Dortaj (CPSO#: 108917 )
Business Address: suite 306-1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 1Z1
6479432530

Corporation Name: Dr Dortaj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Oct 2024

Corporation Name: Dr. Dortaj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Feb 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
28 Jun 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 28 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NICK DORTAJ may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NICK DORTAJ may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: KERMAN UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Sep 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Mar 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 17 Apr 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Nov 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 May 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 May 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 May 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 May 2016