THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:39:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: L122-2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Hospital K3E
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164804107
Fax: 4164804849
Address: 1955 Steeles Ave E
Chartwell Gibson
North York ON M2H 3P1
Phone: 4164985588
Extension: 201
Fax: 416-498-8173

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dana Catherine Mayer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mayer (CPSO#: 108927 )
Business Address: L122-2075 Bayview Ave
K3E
6473902088
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
45 Family Medicine Teaching Unit
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6980

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: L122-2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Hospital K3E
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164804107
Fax: 4164804849
Address: 1955 Steeles Ave E
Chartwell Gibson
North York ON M2H 3P1
Phone: 4164985588
Extension: 201
Fax: 416-498-8173

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dana Catherine Mayer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mayer (CPSO#: 108927 )
Business Address: L122-2075 Bayview Ave
K3E
6473902088
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
45 Family Medicine Teaching Unit
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6980

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANA CATHERINE MAYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAYER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANA CATHERINE MAYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAYER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016