THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:54:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway W
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058487267
Fax: 9058487669

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A MICIELI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Micieli (CPSO#: 108945 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway W
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058487267
Fax: 9058487669

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A MICIELI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Micieli (CPSO#: 108945 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW MARK MICIELI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICIELI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW MARK MICIELI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICIELI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016