THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:56:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI, GERMAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700-145 King St W
Toronto ON M5H 1J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +1 877-419-2378
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ghassemi KASA Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ghassemi Kakroodi (CPSO#: 108954 )
Business Address: 700-145 King St W
Toronto ON M5H 1J8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI, GERMAN, SPANISH
Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700-145 King St W
Toronto ON M5H 1J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +1 877-419-2378
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ghassemi KASA Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ghassemi Kakroodi (CPSO#: 108954 )
Business Address: 700-145 King St W
Toronto ON M5H 1J8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARISA GHASSEMI KAKROODI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHASSEMI KAKROODI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARISA GHASSEMI KAKROODI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHASSEMI KAKROODI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 2016
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 May 2016