THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:39:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Peking University Health Science Center, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 187 Carlton St
Toronto ON M5A 2K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 301-3011
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 166 Brock St
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Mohs Clinic
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
Phone: 6135443400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 80 Micro Court
Unit 101
Markham Ontario L3R 9Z5
Phone: (647) 499-2899
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2295 Bristol Cir
Rejuvenation Dermatology
Oakville ON L6H 6P8
Phone: 4165778359
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 181 Bay St
Cleveland Clinic Canada
Dermatology
30th floor
Toronto ON M5J 2T3
Phone: 4165076600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
China

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Hospital Kingston
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Hospital
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: YUANSHEN HUANG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Huang (CPSO#: 108967 )
Business Address: 187 Carlton St
Toronto ON M5A 2K7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Peking University Health Science Center, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 187 Carlton St
Toronto ON M5A 2K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 301-3011
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 166 Brock St
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Mohs Clinic
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
Phone: 6135443400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 80 Micro Court
Unit 101
Markham Ontario L3R 9Z5
Phone: (647) 499-2899
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2295 Bristol Cir
Rejuvenation Dermatology
Oakville ON L6H 6P8
Phone: 4165778359
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 181 Bay St
Cleveland Clinic Canada
Dermatology
30th floor
Toronto ON M5J 2T3
Phone: 4165076600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
China

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Hospital Kingston
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Hospital
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: YUANSHEN HUANG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Huang (CPSO#: 108967 )
Business Address: 187 Carlton St
Toronto ON M5A 2K7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YUANSHEN HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YUANSHEN HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Peking University Health Science Center, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2016