THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:35:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 343 College St
Clinic
College Medical Care
Toronto ON M5T 1S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165199086
Fax: 4165198503
Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Psychiatry /collaborative care
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 18 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 343 College St
Clinic
College Medical Care
Toronto ON M5T 1S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165199086
Fax: 4165198503
Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Psychiatry /collaborative care
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 18 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANDA ADEL MOSAD BAKHET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKHET is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANDA ADEL MOSAD BAKHET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKHET is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016