THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:19:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Ansley Grove Road, Unit 9
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 3R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 605-8444
Fax: (905) 605-2520
Address: 1650 Elgin Mills Road East,Unit 207
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 0B2
Phone: (905) 237-8647
Fax: (905) 237-8648

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hamid Bimesl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bimesl (CPSO#: 108971 )
Business Address: 207 - 1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 0B2
(905) 237-8647
Business Address: 9-110 Ansley Grove Road
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 3R1
(905) 605-8444

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Ansley Grove Road, Unit 9
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 3R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 605-8444
Fax: (905) 605-2520
Address: 1650 Elgin Mills Road East,Unit 207
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 0B2
Phone: (905) 237-8647
Fax: (905) 237-8648

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hamid Bimesl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bimesl (CPSO#: 108971 )
Business Address: 207 - 1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 0B2
(905) 237-8647
Business Address: 9-110 Ansley Grove Road
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 3R1
(905) 605-8444

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAMID BIMESL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIMESL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAMID BIMESL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIMESL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 May 2016