THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:23:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: OakvilleTrafalgar Memorial Hospita
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville, Ontario
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845 2571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Malkowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Malkowski (CPSO#: 108972 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospita Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: OakvilleTrafalgar Memorial Hospita
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville, Ontario
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845 2571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Malkowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Malkowski (CPSO#: 108972 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospita Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW MALKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALKOWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW MALKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALKOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016