THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:38:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201-320 City Centre Dr
unit 101
Mississauga ON L5B 4P8
Phone: (905)232-0883
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2-490 Harry Walker Pky S
Newmarket ON L3Y 0B3
Phone: 9058688000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4915 Bathurst St
unit #212
North York ON M2R 1X9
Phone: 4162280011
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Owlia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Owlia (CPSO#: 109005 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201-320 City Centre Dr
unit 101
Mississauga ON L5B 4P8
Phone: (905)232-0883
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2-490 Harry Walker Pky S
Newmarket ON L3Y 0B3
Phone: 9058688000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4915 Bathurst St
unit #212
North York ON M2R 1X9
Phone: 4162280011
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Owlia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Owlia (CPSO#: 109005 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AIDA OWLIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OWLIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AIDA OWLIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OWLIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016