THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:31:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 166 Brock St
166 Brock Street
Sydenham 3
Room B3-031
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-549-6666
Extension: 4699
Fax: 613-545-0576
Address: 1455 Bath Road
PO Box 190
Kingston Ontario K7L 4V9
Phone: 6135458598
Fax: 6135363497
Address: 76 Stuart St
Division of Plastic Surgery
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: 613-549-6666
Extension: 4699
Fax: 613-545-0576
Address: 8 Richmond Park Dr
Napanee ON K7R 2Z4
Phone: 613-549-6666
Extension: 4699
Fax: 613-545-0576

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Hospital Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Hospital
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Linden K. Head Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Head (CPSO#: 109012 )
Business Address: 166 Brock St
Sydenham 3
Room S-021-0
Kingston ON K7L 5G2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 166 Brock St
166 Brock Street
Sydenham 3
Room B3-031
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-549-6666
Extension: 4699
Fax: 613-545-0576
Address: 1455 Bath Road
PO Box 190
Kingston Ontario K7L 4V9
Phone: 6135458598
Fax: 6135363497
Address: 76 Stuart St
Division of Plastic Surgery
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: 613-549-6666
Extension: 4699
Fax: 613-545-0576
Address: 8 Richmond Park Dr
Napanee ON K7R 2Z4
Phone: 613-549-6666
Extension: 4699
Fax: 613-545-0576

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Hospital Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Hospital
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Linden K. Head Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Head (CPSO#: 109012 )
Business Address: 166 Brock St
Sydenham 3
Room S-021-0
Kingston ON K7L 5G2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDEN KYLE HEAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDEN KYLE HEAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016