THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 06:05:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
Victory 3
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-2368
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Hale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hale (CPSO#: 109017 )
Business Address: 76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Victory 3
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
(613) 548-2368

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
Victory 3
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-2368
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Hale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hale (CPSO#: 109017 )
Business Address: 76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Victory 3
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
(613) 548-2368

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL KENNETH PATRICK HALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL KENNETH PATRICK HALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Jan 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016