THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:15:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 455 McNeely Ave
Carleton Place ON K7C 4S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-257-7002
Fax: 613-257-8177

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jul 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 12 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.M. Meyers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Meyers (CPSO#: 109019 )
Business Address: 455 McNeely Avenue
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 4S6
Business Address: 44 Lansdowne Ave
Carleton Place ON K7C 2T8
Business Address: 2212 Joanne Ave
Ottawa ON K2B 6V5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 455 McNeely Ave
Carleton Place ON K7C 4S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-257-7002
Fax: 613-257-8177

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jul 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 12 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.M. Meyers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Meyers (CPSO#: 109019 )
Business Address: 455 McNeely Avenue
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 4S6
Business Address: 44 Lansdowne Ave
Carleton Place ON K7C 2T8
Business Address: 2212 Joanne Ave
Ottawa ON K2B 6V5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILIE MEYERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEYERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILIE MEYERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEYERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016