THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:49:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: H1-310 Bridge St W
Napanee ON K7R 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-354-8238
Fax: 1-855-437-1473
Address: 331 Dundas Street
Deseronto Ontario K0K1X0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Khey Beldman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Khey Beldman (CPSO#: 109042 )
Business Address: H1-310 Bridge St W
Napanee ON K7R 0A4
613-354-8238

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: H1-310 Bridge St W
Napanee ON K7R 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-354-8238
Fax: 1-855-437-1473
Address: 331 Dundas Street
Deseronto Ontario K0K1X0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Khey Beldman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Khey Beldman (CPSO#: 109042 )
Business Address: H1-310 Bridge St W
Napanee ON K7R 0A4
613-354-8238

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER LORRAINE KHEY BELDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHEY BELDMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER LORRAINE KHEY BELDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHEY BELDMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016