THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:38:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
366 Main Street North
Brampton Ontario L6V 1P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-455-1331
Fax: 905-455-5498
Address: 20 Lynch St
Brampton Ontario L6W2Z8
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SIMONE BANH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Banh (CPSO#: 109046 )
Business Address: 366 Main Street North, Suite 201
Brampton Ontario L6V 1P8
9054551331
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
905-494-2120
Business Address: 20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
905-494-2120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
366 Main Street North
Brampton Ontario L6V 1P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-455-1331
Fax: 905-455-5498
Address: 20 Lynch St
Brampton Ontario L6W2Z8
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SIMONE BANH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Banh (CPSO#: 109046 )
Business Address: 366 Main Street North, Suite 201
Brampton Ontario L6V 1P8
9054551331
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
905-494-2120
Business Address: 20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
905-494-2120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIMONE BANH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIMONE BANH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016