THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:19:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-361 Main St E
Hawkesbury ON K6A 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-632-0605
Fax: 613-632-7073

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mélanie Lalonde Médecine Société Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lalonde (CPSO#: 109061 )
Business Address: 101-361 Main St E
Hawkesbury ON K6A 1A8
613-632-0605

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-361 Main St E
Hawkesbury ON K6A 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-632-0605
Fax: 613-632-7073

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mélanie Lalonde Médecine Société Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lalonde (CPSO#: 109061 )
Business Address: 101-361 Main St E
Hawkesbury ON K6A 1A8
613-632-0605

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELANIE LALONDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALONDE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELANIE LALONDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALONDE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016