THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:25:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1849 Yonge Street
Suite 207
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-928-3467
Fax: 416-928-3502
Address: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Cardiology Imaging and Clinic
1st Floor East Wing
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6328
Fax: 416-530-6702
Address: 5 Junction Road
Riverside Cardiology
Toronto Ontario M6N 1B6
Phone: 416-766-1162
Fax: 416-766-0463

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. K. JAIDKA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jaidka (CPSO#: 109065 )
Business Address: suite 207-1849 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1849 Yonge Street
Suite 207
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-928-3467
Fax: 416-928-3502
Address: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Cardiology Imaging and Clinic
1st Floor East Wing
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6328
Fax: 416-530-6702
Address: 5 Junction Road
Riverside Cardiology
Toronto Ontario M6N 1B6
Phone: 416-766-1162
Fax: 416-766-0463

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. K. JAIDKA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jaidka (CPSO#: 109065 )
Business Address: suite 207-1849 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ATUL KUMAR JAIDKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIDKA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ATUL KUMAR JAIDKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIDKA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Dec 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016