THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:20:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Songbo Zheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Oct 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zheng (CPSO#: 109088 ) Dr. Y. Zhang (CPSO#: 119162 )
Business Address: 310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Songbo Zheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Oct 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zheng (CPSO#: 109088 ) Dr. Y. Zhang (CPSO#: 119162 )
Business Address: 310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONG BO ZHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHENG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONG BO ZHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHENG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016