THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:20:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2525 Old Bronte Rd
Suite 250
Oakville ON L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)815-0755
Fax: (905)815-0757
Address: 5-2125 Wyecroft Rd
Oakville Endoscopy Centre
Oakville ON L6L 5L7
Phone: (905)842-3666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2525 Old Bronte Rd
Suite 250
Oakville ON L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)815-0755
Fax: (905)815-0757
Address: 5-2125 Wyecroft Rd
Oakville Endoscopy Centre
Oakville ON L6L 5L7
Phone: (905)842-3666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTYNE MIDORI ONIZUKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONIZUKA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTYNE MIDORI ONIZUKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONIZUKA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 May 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016