THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:11:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
379 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-472-2200
Fax: 905-472-5662
Address: 2780 Bur Oak Ave
Yee Hong Markham
Floor 4
Markham ON L6B 1C9
Phone: (905) 471-3232
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 162 Sandiford Dr
Mon Sheong Stouffville Long-Term Care Centre
Stouffville ON L4A 3S3
Phone: 289-469-0323
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yuet Ming Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Lam (CPSO#: 109097 )
Business Address: 33-280 West Beaver Creek Road
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3Z1
(905) 762-1111
Business Address: 202-379 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
(905) 472-2200
Business Address: Chinatown Medical Center
201-480 Dundas Street West
Toronto Ontario M5T 1G9
(416) 591-3988
Business Address: 2780 Bur Oak Avenue
Yee Hong Ho Lai Oi Wan Centre (Markham)
Markham Ontario L6B 1C9
(905) 471-3232

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
379 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-472-2200
Fax: 905-472-5662
Address: 2780 Bur Oak Ave
Yee Hong Markham
Floor 4
Markham ON L6B 1C9
Phone: (905) 471-3232
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 162 Sandiford Dr
Mon Sheong Stouffville Long-Term Care Centre
Stouffville ON L4A 3S3
Phone: 289-469-0323
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yuet Ming Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Lam (CPSO#: 109097 )
Business Address: 33-280 West Beaver Creek Road
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3Z1
(905) 762-1111
Business Address: 202-379 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
(905) 472-2200
Business Address: Chinatown Medical Center
201-480 Dundas Street West
Toronto Ontario M5T 1G9
(416) 591-3988
Business Address: 2780 Bur Oak Avenue
Yee Hong Ho Lai Oi Wan Centre (Markham)
Markham Ontario L6B 1C9
(905) 471-3232

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YUET MING LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YUET MING LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016