THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:27:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Precision Diagnostics & Therapeutics Program (Laboratory Medicine)
B2-204
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-6733
Fax: 416-480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 23 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. HEATHER VANDERMEULEN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. H. VanderMeulen (CPSO#: 109108 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
4164806100 Extn: 61017
Business Address: Old Toronto
700 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M7A 2S4
4165864800 Extn: 7000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Precision Diagnostics & Therapeutics Program (Laboratory Medicine)
B2-204
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-6733
Fax: 416-480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 23 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. HEATHER VANDERMEULEN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. H. VanderMeulen (CPSO#: 109108 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
4164806100 Extn: 61017
Business Address: Old Toronto
700 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M7A 2S4
4165864800 Extn: 7000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER LESLIE VANDERMEULEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERMEULEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER LESLIE VANDERMEULEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERMEULEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016