THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:43:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Centenary
Department of Medicine
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Extension: 7450
Fax: (647) 480-6290

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy Howard Yung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Yung (CPSO#: 109113 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Centenary
Department of Medicine
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Extension: 7450
Fax: (647) 480-6290

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy Howard Yung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Yung (CPSO#: 109113 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY HOWARD YUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY HOWARD YUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016