THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:32:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
St. John's Rehab
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2M 2G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-226-6780
Fax: 416-226-6265
Address: North York General Hospital
8W
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON M2K 1E1
Toronto Ontario M2K1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St John's Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Betty Chiu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chiu (CPSO#: 109134 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
St. John's Rehab
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2M 2G1
(416) 226-6780

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
St. John's Rehab
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2M 2G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-226-6780
Fax: 416-226-6265
Address: North York General Hospital
8W
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON M2K 1E1
Toronto Ontario M2K1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St John's Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Betty Chiu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chiu (CPSO#: 109134 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
St. John's Rehab
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2M 2G1
(416) 226-6780

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BETTY BIK-WAH CHIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BETTY BIK-WAH CHIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016