THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:02:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Division of General Internal Medicine
Room D105
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-5164
Fax: (613) 761-4036
Address: 550 Old St. Patrick St
Ottawa Inner City Health
Ottawa ON K1N 5L5
Phone: (613) 562-4500
Fax: (613) 562-4505
Address: 550 Smyth Road
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Viral Hepatitis Program
Division of Infectious Diseases
Ottawa Ontario K1G 3Z7
Phone: 613-737-8899
Extension: 76362
Fax: 613-739-6666

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. GRAYDON SIMMONS MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Simmons (CPSO#: 109137 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
General Internal Medicine
Room D105
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Division of General Internal Medicine
Room D105
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-5164
Fax: (613) 761-4036
Address: 550 Old St. Patrick St
Ottawa Inner City Health
Ottawa ON K1N 5L5
Phone: (613) 562-4500
Fax: (613) 562-4505
Address: 550 Smyth Road
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Viral Hepatitis Program
Division of Infectious Diseases
Ottawa Ontario K1G 3Z7
Phone: 613-737-8899
Extension: 76362
Fax: 613-739-6666

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. GRAYDON SIMMONS MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Simmons (CPSO#: 109137 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
General Internal Medicine
Room D105
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN GRAYDON SIMMONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMMONS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN GRAYDON SIMMONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMMONS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016