THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:10:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1000 Bay St
Unit 2
Toronto ON M5S 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 923-7770
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jul 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 10 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Red Lake

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Broussenko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Broussenko (CPSO#: 109143 )
Business Address: 250 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1R8
Business Address: 206-222 King St E
Bowmanville ON L1C 1P6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1000 Bay St
Unit 2
Toronto ON M5S 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 923-7770
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jul 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 10 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Red Lake

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Broussenko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Broussenko (CPSO#: 109143 )
Business Address: 250 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1R8
Business Address: 206-222 King St E
Bowmanville ON L1C 1P6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK BROUSSENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROUSSENKO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK BROUSSENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROUSSENKO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016