THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:45:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Smithville Medical Centre
230 Canborough St
Smithville Ontario L0R 2A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 957-3328
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
169 Main St E
Grimsby Ontario L3M 5J5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: McNally House Hospice
148 Central Ave
Grimsby Ontario L3M 4Z3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Niagara Health - St Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Sjaarda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sjaarda (CPSO#: 109157 )
Business Address: Smithville Medical Centre
230 Canborough Street
Smithville Ontario L0R 2A0
(905) 957-3328
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 5J5
(905) 945-2253

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Smithville Medical Centre
230 Canborough St
Smithville Ontario L0R 2A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 957-3328
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
169 Main St E
Grimsby Ontario L3M 5J5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: McNally House Hospice
148 Central Ave
Grimsby Ontario L3M 4Z3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Niagara Health - St Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Sjaarda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sjaarda (CPSO#: 109157 )
Business Address: Smithville Medical Centre
230 Canborough Street
Smithville Ontario L0R 2A0
(905) 957-3328
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 5J5
(905) 945-2253

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID RICHARD SJAARDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SJAARDA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID RICHARD SJAARDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SJAARDA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jan 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016