THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:49:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2464 Howard Ave
Suite 103B
Windsor ON N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-915-1458
Fax: 519-252-3444

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 07 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Cribby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cribby (CPSO#: 109164 )
Business Address: 101-3335 Dougall Ave
Windsor ON N9E 1S8
519-915-1458
Business Address: 2464 Howard Ave
Suite 103B
Windsor ON N8X 3V6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2464 Howard Ave
Suite 103B
Windsor ON N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-915-1458
Fax: 519-252-3444

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 07 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Cribby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cribby (CPSO#: 109164 )
Business Address: 101-3335 Dougall Ave
Windsor ON N9E 1S8
519-915-1458
Business Address: 2464 Howard Ave
Suite 103B
Windsor ON N8X 3V6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH RUTH CRIBBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRIBBY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH RUTH CRIBBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRIBBY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2016